OK HB2566 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2566
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - Approved by Governor 04/27/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - Approved by Governor 04/27/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Health care; long-term care; facilities; residents; visitation; health care providers; State Department of Health; emergency.
Title
Health care; long-term care; facilities; residents; visitation; health care providers; State Department of Health; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | House | Approved by Governor 04/27/2021 |
2021-04-22 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-22 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 2 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Remove as coauthor Senator Allen |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Allen |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2021-03-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 1 |
2021-03-09 | House | Amended |
2021-03-09 | House | House Rule suspended |
2021-03-09 | House | Authored by Senator McCortney (principal Senate author) |
2021-03-09 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Conley, Dills, Boles, Lepak, Russ |
2021-03-09 | House | General Order |
2021-02-18 | House | Emergency added |
2021-02-18 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis, West (Tammy), Stark |
2021-02-18 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Health Services and Long-Term Care |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Caldwell (Chad) |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2566 (Carry Over) 2021-04-27 - Approved by Governor 04/27/2021