OK HB2565 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2565
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Children's Code; modifying definitions; effective date.
Title
Children's Code; modifying definitions; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Chad Caldwell [R] | Sen. Julie Daniels [R] | Rep. Todd Russ [R] | Rep. Mark Lepak [R] |
Rep. Jacob Rosecrants [D] | Sen. Micheal Bergstrom [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-28 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 86 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House: Judiciary-Civil Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House: Judiciary-Civil Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | House | Approved by Governor 05/03/2021 |
2021-04-29 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-29 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2021-04-28 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-28 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 2 |
2021-04-28 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Bergstrom |
2021-04-28 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Lepak |
2021-04-28 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2021-04-22 | House | SA's received |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 9 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2021-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-04 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-03 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-03 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 1 |
2021-03-03 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Russ |
2021-03-03 | House | General Order |
2021-02-24 | House | Authored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author) |
2021-02-24 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Rosecrants |
2021-02-24 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Caldwell (Chad) |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2565 (Carry Over) 2021-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2021