OK HB2561 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Public health and safety; civil actions against abortion provider; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public health and safety; civil actions against abortion provider; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-02 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Senate: MOTION (Y: 31 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-08 Approved by Governor 05/08/2012
2012-05-03 Sent to Governor
2012-05-03 Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
2012-05-03 Enrolled, signed, to Senate
2012-05-02 Referred for enrollment
2012-05-02 Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0
2012-05-02 SA's read, adopted
2012-04-25 SA's received
2012-04-25 Engrossed to House
2012-04-24 Referred for engrossment
2012-04-24 Measure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 9
2012-04-24 General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2012-04-09 coauthored by Shortey
2012-04-09 coauthored by Hamilton, Johnson
2012-04-09 Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
2012-03-21 Second Reading referred to Judiciary
2012-03-19 First Reading
2012-03-19 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2012-03-15 Referred for engrossment
2012-03-15 Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 10
2012-03-15 Coauthored by Representative(s) Faught, Kern, Ritze, Peterson, Coody, Moore
2012-03-15 General Order
2012-02-28 Authored by Senator Jolley (principal Senate author)
2012-02-28 CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee
2012-02-07 Second Reading referred to Judiciary
2012-02-06 Authored by Representative Wesselhoft
2012-02-06 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
631738Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback