OK HB2555 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2555
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-30 - Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-30 - Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Scholarships; creating the Oklahoma Critical Industries Scholarship Program; effective date; emergency.
Title
Scholarships; creating the Oklahoma Critical Industries Scholarship Program; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark McBride [R] | Sen. Roger Thompson [R] | Rep. Rhonda Baker [R] | Rep. Tammy West [R] |
Rep. John Waldron [D] | Rep. Anthony Moore [R] | Rep. Eric Roberts [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2023-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 |
2023-03-09 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts |
2023-03-09 | House | General Order |
2023-03-02 | House | Title stricken |
2023-03-02 | House | Authored by Senator Thompson (Roger) (principal Senate author) |
2023-03-02 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Waldron, West (Tammy), Moore |
2023-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2023-02-14 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2023-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative McBride, Baker |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2555 (Carry Over) 2023-03-30 - Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee