OK HB2548 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Memorial highway designations; MSG Joshua Wheeler memorial highway; modifying name; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Memorial highway designations; MSG Joshua Wheeler memorial highway; modifying name; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-16 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23HouseApproved by Governor 04/23/2018
2018-04-17HouseSent to Governor
2018-04-17SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2018-04-17HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2018-04-16HouseReferred for enrollment
2018-04-16SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2018-04-16SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
2018-04-16SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2018-03-27SenateReported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed
2018-03-20SenateSecond Reading referred to Transportation
2018-03-08Senatecoauthored by Ritze
2018-03-08SenateFirst Reading
2018-03-08HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2018-03-07HouseReferred for engrossment
2018-03-07HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0
2018-03-07HouseAuthored by Senator Allen (principal Senate author)
2018-03-07HouseGeneral Order
2018-02-20HouseCR; Do Pass Transportation Committee
2018-02-06HouseSecond Reading referred to Transportation
2018-02-05HouseAuthored by Representative Bennett (John)
2018-02-05HouseFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
691698241New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2548&Session=1800
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20INT/hB/HB2548%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/HFLR/HB2548%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENGR/hB/HB2548%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/SFLR/HB2548%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENR/hB/HB2548%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/HB2548_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2548_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB2548_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback