OK HB2547 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2547
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-11 - Coauthored by Senator Bullard
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-11 - Coauthored by Senator Bullard
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Firearms; authorizing municipalities to allow for the carry of concealed firearms by municipal employees for personal protection; effective date.
Title
Firearms; authorizing municipalities to allow for the carry of concealed firearms by municipal employees for personal protection; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Sean Roberts [R] | Sen. Micheal Bergstrom [R] | Rep. Dustin Roberts [R] | Rep. Justin Humphrey [R] |
Rep. Kevin McDugle [R] | Sen. David Bullard [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House: TABLE APPEAL (Y: 69 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House: TABLE (Y: 69 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House: TABLE (Y: 69 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bullard |
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2020-03-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 21 |
2020-03-11 | House | Amended |
2020-03-11 | House | Authored by Senator Bergstrom (principal Senate author) |
2020-03-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Humphrey, Roberts (Dustin) |
2020-03-11 | House | General Order |
2020-02-27 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle |
2020-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee |
2020-02-20 | House | Referred to Public Safety |
2020-02-20 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Roberts (Sean) |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2547 (Carry Over) 2019-02-06 - Second Reading referred to Rules