OK HB2545 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB2545

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - Referred to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Public health and safety; creating the Oklahoma for Life Act; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public health and safety; creating the Oklahoma for Life Act; effective date.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-27HouseReferred to Rules
2020-02-27HouseWithdrawn from Public Safety Committee
2020-02-17HouseReferred to Public Safety
2020-02-17HouseWithdrawn from Rules Committee
2019-02-06HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Roberts (Sean)
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

HB2545 (Carry Over) 2019-02-06 - Second Reading referred to Rules

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback