OK HB2541 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-20 - Coauthored by Representative(s) Humphrey
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-20 - Coauthored by Representative(s) Humphrey
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Tobacco in prisons; providing an exemption for institutions of the Department of Corrections; codification; effective date.
Title
Tobacco in prisons; providing an exemption for institutions of the Department of Corrections; codification; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-20 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-20 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Humphrey |
2018-02-20 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee |
2018-02-19 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2018-02-19 | House | Withdrawn from Public Safety Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative West (Rick) |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
57 | 537 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 1 | 1523 | New Code | See Bill Text |