OK HB2540 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-11 - Laid over
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]

Summary

Motor vehicles; modifying scope of unlawful use of electronic device; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles; modifying scope of unlawful use of electronic device; effective date.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-11HouseLaid over
2014-03-11HouseAmended
2014-03-11HouseAuthored by Senator Stanislawski (principal Senate author)
2014-03-11HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Hoskin, Sherrer, McDaniel (Jeannie)
2014-03-11HouseGeneral Order
2014-02-26HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Henke
2014-02-26HouseCR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee
2014-02-20HouseReferred to Public Safety Committee
2014-02-20HouseWithdrawn from Judiciary Committee
2014-02-04HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2014-02-03HouseAuthored by Representative O'Donnell
2014-02-03HouseFirst Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4711901cNew CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback