OK HB2536 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2536
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; Small Employer Quality Jobs Act; modifying reference; sales percentage; effective date; emergency.
Title
Revenue and taxation; Small Employer Quality Jobs Act; modifying reference; sales percentage; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | House | Approved by Governor 04/29/2019 |
2019-04-24 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-24 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-23 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Emergency passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 6 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 8 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Title restored |
2019-04-23 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Withdrawn from Finance committee |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2019-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 5 |
2019-03-12 | House | General Order |
2019-02-28 | House | Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author) |
2019-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2019-02-11 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Blancett |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2536 (Carry Over) 2019-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2019