OK HB2536 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revenue and taxation; Small Employer Quality Jobs Act; modifying reference; sales percentage; effective date; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revenue and taxation; Small Employer Quality Jobs Act; modifying reference; sales percentage; effective date; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29HouseApproved by Governor 04/29/2019
2019-04-24HouseSent to Governor
2019-04-24SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2019-04-24HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2019-04-23HouseReferred for enrollment
2019-04-23SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2019-04-23SenateEmergency passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 6
2019-04-23SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 8
2019-04-23SenateAmendment restored bill to engrossed version
2019-04-23SenateEmergency clause restored
2019-04-23SenateTitle restored
2019-04-23SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2019-04-11SenateEmergency clause stricken
2019-04-11SenateTitle stricken
2019-04-11SenateReported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
2019-04-09SenateReferred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
2019-04-09SenateWithdrawn from Finance committee
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading referred to Finance
2019-03-13SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-13HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-12HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-12HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 5
2019-03-12HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-28HouseAuthored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author)
2019-02-28HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
2019-02-11HouseRecommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee
2019-02-07HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Blancett
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback