OK HB2531 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-17 - Approved by Governor 05/17/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revenue and taxation; creating the Retail Protection Act of 2016; sales tax; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revenue and taxation; creating the Retail Protection Act of 2016; sales tax; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-12 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 70 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 31 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 51 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-17HouseApproved by Governor 05/17/2016
2016-05-16HouseSent to Governor
2016-05-16SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2016-05-16HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2016-05-12HouseReferred for enrollment
2016-05-12HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 18
2016-05-12HouseAyes: 61 Nays: 26
2016-05-12HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Jech
2016-05-12HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Hickman
2016-05-12HouseSA's read, adopted
2016-04-25HouseSA's received
2016-04-25SenateEngrossed to House
2016-04-21SenateReferred for engrossment
2016-04-21SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 12
2016-04-21SenateTitle restored
2016-04-21SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2016-04-05SenateTitle stricken
2016-04-05SenateReported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
2016-03-21SenateSecond Reading referred to Finance
2016-03-14SenateFirst Reading
2016-03-14HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2016-03-10HouseReferred for engrossment
2016-03-10HouseMotion to reconsider tabled
2016-03-10HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 51 Nays: 39
2016-03-10HouseAmended
2016-03-10HouseAuthored by Senator Ford (principal Senate author)
2016-03-10HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Denney, Kannady, Wright
2016-03-10HouseGeneral Order
2016-02-24HouseRemove Representative Casey as principal House author and substitute with Representative Caldwell
2016-02-24HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
2016-02-17HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget
2016-02-17HouseWithdrawn from Rules Committee
2016-02-02HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2016-02-01HouseAuthored by Representative Casey
2016-02-01HouseFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6813541Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
6813542New CodeSee Bill Text
6813543New CodeSee Bill Text
6813544Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
6813545Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
6813546Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
6814062Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6814072New CodeSee Bill Text
6814073New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2531&Session=1600
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20INT/hB/HB2531%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB2531%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/HFLR/HB2531%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENGR/hB/HB2531%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/SFLR/HB2531%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB2531%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENR/hB/HB2531%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/HB2531_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/HB2531_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback