OK HB2530 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revenue and taxation; sales tax exemption; access to advanced manufacturing and digital fabrication tools; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revenue and taxation; sales tax exemption; access to advanced manufacturing and digital fabrication tools; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-09 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 70 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 33 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16HouseApproved by Governor 05/16/2019
2019-05-13HouseSent to Governor
2019-05-13SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2019-05-13HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2019-05-09HouseReferred for enrollment
2019-05-09HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 17
2019-05-09HouseSA's read, adopted
2019-04-24HouseSA's received
2019-04-24SenateEngrossed to House
2019-04-23SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-04-23SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 12
2019-04-23SenateEnacting clause restored
2019-04-23SenateTitle restored
2019-04-23SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2019-04-23SenateCoauthored by Senator Bergstrom
2019-04-09SenateEnacting clause stricken
2019-04-09SenateReported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading referred to Finance
2019-03-11SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-11HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-07HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-07HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 4
2019-03-07HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-28HouseTitle stricken
2019-02-28HouseAuthored by Senator Thompson (principal Senate author)
2019-02-28HouseCR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
2019-02-11HouseRecommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee
2019-02-07HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Blancett
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2530&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/hB/HB2530%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/HB2530%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/hB/HB2530%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/HB2530%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB2530%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/hB/HB2530%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2530_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB2530_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback