OK HB2528 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
State government; Whistleblower Act; providing for right to file civil action; effective date.
Title
State government; Whistleblower Act; providing for right to file civil action; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: General Government Oversight and Accountability Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: General Government Oversight and Accountability Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2018-03-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-12 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-08 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0 |
2018-03-08 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Bergstrom |
2018-03-08 | House | General Order |
2018-02-12 | House | Authored by Senator Fry (principal Senate author) |
2018-02-12 | House | CR; Do Pass General Government Oversight and Accountability Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to General Government Oversight and Accountability |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Cleveland |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |