OK HB2523 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Coauthored by Representative(s) Branham
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Crimes and punishments; modifying scope of certain prohibited act; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes and punishments; modifying scope of certain prohibited act; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-26 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Branham
2019-02-27HouseCR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative West (Tammy)
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback