OK HB2522 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Approved by Governor 04/17/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Approved by Governor 04/17/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Employment Security Administration Fund; appropriation; purpose; standards; effective date.
Title
Employment Security Administration Fund; appropriation; purpose; standards; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 31 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | House | Approved by Governor 04/17/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | Sent to Governor |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-11 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2018-04-10 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 11 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Title restored |
2018-04-10 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2018-03-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-05 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-01 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-01 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 |
2018-03-01 | House | General Order |
2018-02-20 | House | Authored by Senator Stanislawski (principal Senate author) |
2018-02-20 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative McDaniel |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |