OK HB2520 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]

Summary

State government; enacting the Government Reorganization Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State government; enacting the Government Reorganization Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 73 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-25 Died in conference
2012-05-03 Conference granted, GCCA
2012-04-26 SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Government Modernization and Rules
2012-04-25 SA's received
2012-04-25 Engrossed to House
2012-04-24 Referred for engrossment
2012-04-24 Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
2012-04-24 General Order, Considered
2012-04-09 Title stricken
2012-04-09 Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2012-03-28 Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-General Government and Transportation sub-committee
2012-03-19 Referred to Appr/Sub-General Government and Transportation
2012-03-15 Second Reading referred to Appropriations
2012-03-12 First Reading
2012-03-12 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2012-03-08 Referred for engrossment
2012-03-08 Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 13
2012-03-08 Amended
2012-03-08 House Rule suspended
2012-03-08 Authored by Senator Holt (principal Senate author)
2012-03-08 General Order
2012-02-23 Emergency removed
2012-02-23 CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Modernization Committee
2012-02-07 Second Reading referred to Government Modernization
2012-02-06 Authored by Representative Murphey
2012-02-06 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62451New CodeSee Bill Text
624510Amended CodeSee Bill Text
624511Amended CodeSee Bill Text
748403Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback