OK HB2517 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2517
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Birth defects; updating definition; effective date.
Title
Birth defects; updating definition; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Tammy West [R] | Sen. Paul Rosino [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | Approved by Governor 04/25/2019 |
2019-04-22 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-18 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-17 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2019-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-14 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 1 |
2019-03-13 | House | Amended |
2019-03-13 | House | Authored by Senator Rosino (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-13 | House | General Order |
2019-02-13 | House | CR; Do Pass Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Health Services and Long-Term Care |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative West (Tammy) |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2517 (Carry Over) 2019-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2019