OK HB2509 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-19 - CCR read
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-19 - CCR read
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; requirements for adult cabarets and sexually oriented businesses; modifying scope of prohibited act; effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishments; requirements for adult cabarets and sexually oriented businesses; modifying scope of prohibited act; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Lisa Billy [R] | Sen. Kim David [R] | Rep. Sally Kern [R] | Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] |
Rep. Chuck Hoskin [D] | Sen. Corey Brooks [R] | Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-19 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | Senate | CCR read |
2016-05-19 | House | To Senate |
2016-05-19 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 1 |
2016-05-19 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Kern |
2016-05-19 | House | CCR adopted |
2016-05-16 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Pittman |
2016-05-16 | House | CCR submitted |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named David, Barrington, Holt, Ford, Fields, Matthews, Pittman |
2016-04-27 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Children, Youth, and Family Services |
2016-04-21 | House | SA's received |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2016-04-07 | Senate | coauthored by Hoskin |
2016-04-04 | Senate | coauthored by Brooks |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2016-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-15 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-02-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 |
2016-02-11 | House | Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author) |
2016-02-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer |
2016-02-11 | House | General Order |
2016-02-09 | House | CR; Do Pass Children, Youth and Family Services Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services |
2016-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Billy |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |