OK HB2506 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-15 - Title restored
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-15 - Title restored
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Small claims; procedure; removing exclusion of libel or slander action; permitting action brought by lienholder to a titled vehicle; effective date.
Title
Small claims; procedure; removing exclusion of libel or slander action; permitting action brought by lienholder to a titled vehicle; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Title restored |
2014-05-15 | House | CCR submitted |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Newberry, Sykes, David, Brecheen, Sparks, Shumate |
2014-04-28 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Economic Development and Financial Services |
2014-04-16 | House | SA's received |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2014-02-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-25 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-02-24 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-02-24 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 5 |
2014-02-24 | House | Authored by Senator Newberry (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-24 | House | General Order |
2014-02-06 | House | CR; Do Pass Economic Development and Financial Services Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative McDaniel (Randy) |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |