OK HB2504 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate General Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Health; city-county boards of health; city-county health departments; State Commissioner of Health; medical directors; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health; city-county boards of health; city-county health departments; State Commissioner of Health; medical directors; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 54 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House: Judiciary-Civil Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-17SenateSecond Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2021-03-11SenateFirst Reading
2021-03-11HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2021-03-10HouseReferred for engrossment
2021-03-10HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 54 Nays: 41
2021-03-10HouseAmended by floor substitute
2021-03-10HouseAuthored by Senator Rosino (principal Senate author)
2021-03-10HouseGeneral Order
2021-02-24HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Civil Committee
2021-02-02HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil
2021-02-01HouseAuthored by Representative Kannady
2021-02-01HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2504&Session=2100
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/hB/HB2504%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB2504%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/HFLR/HB2504%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENGR/hB/HB2504%20ENGR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB2504%20FULLPCS1%20CHRIS%20KANNADY-AB.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB2504%20FA1%20KANNADYCH-AB.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2504%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2504%20FULLPCS1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2504%20CS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2504%20FA1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/impact%20statements/fiscal/senate/HB2504%20ENGR%20FI.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2504_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments 750

feedback