OK HB2494 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Approved by Governor 05/30/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Approved by Governor 05/30/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; adding certain data to be used to determine a high school annual report card grade; effective date.
Title
Schools; adding certain data to be used to determine a high school annual report card grade; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Lee Denney [R] | Sen. Jim Halligan [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-25 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 29 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 53 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 76 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - House - House: TABLE (Y: 45 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - House - House: Conference Committee on Education: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 53 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 76 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - House - House: TABLE (Y: 45 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - House - House: Conference Committee on Education: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | Approved by Governor 05/30/2012 | |
2012-05-25 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-25 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-05-25 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-05-25 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-25 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 29 Nays: 12 | |
2012-05-25 | CCR adopted | |
2012-05-24 | CCR read | |
2012-05-24 | To Senate | |
2012-05-24 | Motion to reconsider tabled | |
2012-05-22 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Proctor | |
2012-05-22 | Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 14; Ayes: 53 Nays: 35 | |
2012-05-22 | CCR adopted | |
2012-05-18 | CCR submitted | |
2012-05-03 | Conference granted, SCs named Halligan, Ford, Barrington, Crain, Garrison, Paddack | |
2012-04-25 | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Education | |
2012-04-19 | SA's received | |
2012-04-19 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-04-18 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-18 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-18 | Title restored | |
2012-04-18 | General Order, Amended | |
2012-04-18 | Senate Rule suspended | |
2012-03-20 | Title stricken | |
2012-03-20 | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Education | |
2012-02-16 | First Reading | |
2012-02-16 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-02-15 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-02-15 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 | |
2012-02-15 | Amended | |
2012-02-15 | General Order | |
2012-02-09 | Authored by Senator Halligan (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-09 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Denney | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |