OK HB2490 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future HB2490

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Criminal procedure; district attorneys; extension of supervision; dismissal of charges; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal procedure; district attorneys; extension of supervision; dismissal of charges; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-10 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 83 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-15HouseApproved by Governor 05/15/2023
2023-05-11HouseSent to Governor
2023-05-11SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2023-05-11HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2023-05-10HouseReferred for enrollment
2023-05-10HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 2
2023-05-10HouseSA's read, adopted
2023-04-27HouseSA's received
2023-04-27SenateEngrossed to House
2023-04-26SenateReferred for engrossment
2023-04-26SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
2023-04-26SenateEnacting clause restored
2023-04-26SenateTitle restored
2023-04-26SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2023-04-20SenateCoauthored by Representative Pae
2023-04-11SenateEnacting clause stricken
2023-04-11SenateReported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed
2023-03-30SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2023-03-22SenateFirst Reading
2023-03-22HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2023-03-21HouseReferred for engrossment
2023-03-21HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0
2023-03-21HouseAmended by floor substitute
2023-03-21HouseHouse Rule suspended
2023-03-21HouseAuthored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author)
2023-03-21HouseGeneral Order
2023-03-02HouseTitle stricken
2023-03-02HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
2023-02-07HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2023-02-06HouseAuthored by Representative Hill
2023-02-06HouseFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

HB2490 (Carry Over) 2023-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2023

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2490&Session=2300
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20INT/hB/HB2490%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB2490%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/HFLR/HB2490%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20ENGR/hB/HB2490%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/SFLR/HB2490%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB2490%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20ENR/hB/HB2490%20ENR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB2490%20FULLPCS1%20BRIAN%20HILL-GRS.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB2490%20FA1%20HILLBR-GRS(UNTIMELY%20FILED).PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/HB2490%20(4-25-23)%20(DANIELS)%20FS%20FA1.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/HB2490%20(4-25-23)%20(DANIELS)%20RT%20FA2.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2490%20FULLPCS1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2490%20CS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2490%20FA1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/HB2490%20FA1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2490%20SAHB%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2490_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB2490_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback