OK HB2479 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 61-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Approved by Governor 03/13/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Office of Juvenile Affairs; the Board of Juvenile Affairs; modifying appointment of members of the Board; authorizing Governor to appoint Executive Director; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Office of Juvenile Affairs; the Board of Juvenile Affairs; modifying appointment of members of the Board; authorizing Governor to appoint Executive Director; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Government Efficiency Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13HouseApproved by Governor 03/13/2019
2019-03-13HouseSent to Governor
2019-03-13SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2019-03-13HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2019-03-13HouseReferred for enrollment
2019-03-13SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2019-03-13SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 9
2019-03-13SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-03-07SenateCoauthored by Representative Ford
2019-03-07SenateReported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed
2019-03-07SenateCoauthored by Representative Wright
2019-03-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Rules
2019-03-06SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-06HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-06HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-06HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 22
2019-03-06HouseAmended
2019-03-06HouseAuthored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author)
2019-03-06HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Boles, West (Josh), Osburn, Frix, Fetgatter, West (Tammy), Olsen, Vancuren, McEntire, Manger, Steagall, Kiger, CrosswhiteHader, Phillips, Smith, Strom, Cornwell, Davis, Burns, Hasenbeck, Dills, Sterling, Fincher, Moore, Marti, Miller, Pae, May, McBride, West (Kevin), Bush, Talley, Lepak, Sims, Stark, Conley, Taylor, Grego, Hardin (David), Patzkowsky, Boatman, Luttrell, Gann, Kerbs, Echols, Hill, Caldwell (Trey), McDugle, Johns, Kannady, Wallace, Hilbert, Baker, Roberts (Sean), Townley
2019-03-06HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-27HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Lawson, Mize
2019-02-27HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Efficiency Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Government Efficiency
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative McCall
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback