OK HB2479 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-27 - Approved by Governor 04/27/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-27 - Approved by Governor 04/27/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Drugs; Uniform Controlled Dangerous Substances Act; modifying penalties for certain prohibited acts; effective date.
Title
Drugs; Uniform Controlled Dangerous Substances Act; modifying penalties for certain prohibited acts; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Pam Peterson [R] | Sen. Greg Treat [R] | Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] | Sen. Kim David [R] |
Sen. Corey Brooks [R] | Rep. Regina Goodwin [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-27 | House | Approved by Governor 04/27/2016 |
2016-04-21 | House | Sent to Governor |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2016-04-21 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2016-04-21 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2016-04-20 | Senate | coauthored by David |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 2 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Title restored |
2016-04-20 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2016-04-07 | Senate | coauthored by Goodwin |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary sub-committee |
2016-03-30 | Senate | coauthored by Brooks |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2016-03-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-03-07 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 15 |
2016-03-07 | House | Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author) |
2016-03-07 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer |
2016-03-07 | House | General Order |
2016-02-24 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2016-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Peterson |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 51 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 402 | New Code | See Bill Text |