OK HB2478 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Revenue and taxation; modifying application to certain license holders; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revenue and taxation; modifying application to certain license holders; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Government Efficiency Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23HouseDied in conference
2019-05-07SenateConference granted, SCs named Treat, Bice, Montgomery, Stanley, Floyd, Kirt
2019-05-02HouseSA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Government Efficiency
2019-04-29HouseSA's received
2019-04-29SenateEngrossed to House
2019-04-25SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-04-25SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
2019-04-25SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-04-09SenateTitle stricken
2019-04-09SenateReported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading referred to Finance
2019-02-12SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-12HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-02-11HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-02-11HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 99 Nays: 0
2019-02-11HouseAuthored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author)
2019-02-11HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-06HouseCR; Do Pass Government Efficiency Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Government Efficiency
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative McCall
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback