OK HB2465 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2465
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Vetoed 04/30/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Vetoed 04/30/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State government; Oklahoma Personnel Act; prohibiting use of compensatory time if sick leave is available; requiring payment of overtime for certain employees; effective date.
Title
State government; Oklahoma Personnel Act; prohibiting use of compensatory time if sick leave is available; requiring payment of overtime for certain employees; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 75 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 75 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Vetoed 04/30/2019 |
2019-04-24 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-24 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-23 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 2 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-04-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-17 | Senate | First Reading rescinded |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Second Reading rescinded |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Third Reading and advancement rescinded |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Signing rescinded |
2019-04-17 | House | To Senate |
2019-04-17 | House | Recalled from enrollment |
2019-04-16 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 3 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Title restored |
2019-04-16 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-General Government and Transportation sub-committee |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-General Government and Transportation |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-18 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 19 |
2019-03-14 | House | Amended |
2019-03-14 | House | Authored by Senator Rosino (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-14 | House | General Order |
2019-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2019-02-25 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Dunnington |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2465 (Carry Over) 2019-04-30 - Vetoed 04/30/2019