OK HB2464 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future HB2464

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Motor vehicles; creating the Independent Driver Classification Act; requiring Transportation Network Company drivers be independent contractors if certain conditions are met; detailing certain conditions; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles; creating the Independent Driver Classification Act; requiring Transportation Network Company drivers be independent contractors if certain conditions are met; detailing certain conditions; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-18 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Aeronautics & Transportation: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 73 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-24HouseApproved by Governor 04/21/2023
2023-04-19HouseSent to Governor
2023-04-19SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2023-04-19HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2023-04-18HouseReferred for enrollment
2023-04-18SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2023-04-18SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 7
2023-04-18SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2023-04-11SenateReported Do Pass Aeronautics and Transportation committee; CR filed
2023-03-30SenateSecond Reading referred to Aeronautics and Transportation
2023-03-14SenateFirst Reading
2023-03-14HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2023-03-13HouseReferred for engrossment
2023-03-13HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 16
2023-03-13HouseGeneral Order
2023-02-28HouseAuthored by Senator Paxton (principal Senate author)
2023-02-28HouseCR; Do Pass Rules Committee
2023-02-07HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2023-02-06HouseAuthored by Representative Hill
2023-02-06HouseFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

HB2464 (Carry Over) 2023-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2023

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2464&Session=2300
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20INT/hB/HB2464%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/HFLR/HB2464%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20ENGR/hB/HB2464%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/SFLR/HB2464%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20ENR/hB/HB2464%20ENR.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2464%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2464_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB2464_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback