OK HB2460 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2460
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-27 - Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-27 - Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Labor; nonsmoking as condition for employment; removing certain condition for employment; effective date.
Title
Labor; nonsmoking as condition for employment; removing certain condition for employment; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - House - House: Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | House | Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author) |
2019-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Health Services and Long-Term Care |
2019-02-13 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Dunnington |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2460 (Carry Over) 2019-02-27 - Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author)