OK HB2454 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Approved by Governor 04/16/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Motor vehicles; allowing bicycles to proceed through red light in certain situations; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles; allowing bicycles to proceed through red light in certain situations; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16HouseApproved by Governor 04/16/2019
2019-04-11HouseSent to Governor
2019-04-11SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2019-04-11HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2019-04-10HouseReferred for enrollment
2019-04-10SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2019-04-10SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2
2019-04-10SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-03-25SenateReported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
2019-03-18SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2019-03-05SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-05HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-04HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-04HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 3
2019-03-04HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Bennett, Ranson, Bush, Pae, Blancett, Ortega, Sims
2019-03-04HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-14HouseAuthored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author)
2019-02-14HouseCR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Dunnington, Moore
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback