OK HB2449 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Elections; municipal elections; modifying information contained in certain resolution; effective date; emergency.
Title
Elections; municipal elections; modifying information contained in certain resolution; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-24 | Approved by Governor 04/24/2012 | |
2012-04-18 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-04-18 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-18 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-17 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-04-17 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-17 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-17 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-04-09 | Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2012-02-23 | First Reading | |
2012-02-23 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-02-22 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-02-22 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 | |
2012-02-22 | General Order | |
2012-02-15 | Authored by Senator Brinkley (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-15 | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Quinn | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |