OK HB2446 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
University Hospitals Authority; requiring expenditure; stating purpose; modifying restrictions on revolving fund usage; declaring legislative intent. Effective date.
Title
University Hospitals Authority; requiring expenditure; stating purpose; modifying restrictions on revolving fund usage; declaring legislative intent. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Johnson [R] | Rep. Scott Martin [R] | Rep. Ken Miller [R] | Sen. David Myers [R] |
Rep. Mike Ritze [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-27 - House - House: (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Approved by Governor 06/10/2010 | |
2010-05-28 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-28 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-05-28 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-05-28 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-28 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-28 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2010-05-28 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2010-05-27 | To Senate | |
2010-05-27 | Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 98 Nays: 0; Ayes: 66 Nays: 32 | |
2010-05-27 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ritze | |
2010-05-27 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2010-05-26 | Enacting clause restored | |
2010-05-26 | Title restored | |
2010-05-26 | CCR submitted, GCCA | |
2010-05-06 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2010-04-15 | SA's rejected, conference requested, GCCA | |
2010-04-05 | SA's received | |
2010-04-05 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-03-31 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-31 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 | |
2010-03-31 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2010-03-31 | General Order, Amended | |
2010-02-09 | Direct to Calendar | |
2010-02-08 | First Reading | |
2010-02-08 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-02-04 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-02-04 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 13 | |
2010-02-04 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-04 | Amended | |
2010-02-04 | General Order | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading, direct to Calendar | |
2010-02-01 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Myers | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Johnson (Mike) (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Miller, Martin (Scott) | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |