OK HB2433 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; making certain acts unlawful; effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishments; making certain acts unlawful; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-24 | Approved by Governor 04/24/2012 | |
2012-04-18 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-04-18 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-18 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-17 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-04-17 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-17 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1 | |
2012-04-17 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-04-03 | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2012-02-29 | First Reading | |
2012-02-29 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-02-28 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-02-28 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0 | |
2012-02-28 | General Order | |
2012-02-21 | Authored by Senator Ballenger (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-21 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Roan | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |