OK HB2424 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Approved by Governor 05/21/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Insurance; Multiple Employer Welfare Arrangement; modifying filing requirements; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance; Multiple Employer Welfare Arrangement; modifying filing requirements; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21HouseApproved by Governor 05/21/2019
2019-05-17HouseSent to Governor
2019-05-17SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2019-05-17HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2019-05-16HouseReferred for enrollment
2019-05-16HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 16
2019-05-16HouseSA's read, adopted
2019-04-24HouseSA's received
2019-04-24SenateEngrossed to House
2019-04-23SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-04-23SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
2019-04-23SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-04-08SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
2019-03-13SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-13HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-12HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-12HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 6
2019-03-12HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-28HouseAuthored by Senator Stanislawski (principal Senate author)
2019-02-28HouseCR; Do Pass Insurance Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Insurance
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Moore
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2424&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/hB/HB2424%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/HB2424%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/hB/HB2424%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCSH/HB2424%20SCSH.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/HB2424%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB2424%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/hB/HB2424%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2424_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB2424_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback