OK HB2414 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future HB2414

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-30 - Second Reading referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Schools; charter schools; modifying provisions of the Oklahoma Charter Schools Act to provide transparency and accountability; effective date; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; charter schools; modifying provisions of the Oklahoma Charter Schools Act to provide transparency and accountability; effective date; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-30SenateSecond Reading referred to Education
2023-03-22SenateFirst Reading
2023-03-22HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2023-03-21HouseReferred for engrossment
2023-03-21HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 0
2023-03-21HouseAuthored by Senator Pemberton (principal Senate author)
2023-03-21HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Waldron
2023-03-21HouseGeneral Order
2023-02-28HouseCR; Do Pass Common Education Committee
2023-02-07HouseSecond Reading referred to Common Education
2023-02-06HouseAuthored by Representative Johns
2023-02-06HouseFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

HB2414 (Carry Over) 2023-03-30 - Second Reading referred to Education

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback