OK HB2414 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2414
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-08 - Referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections
Pending: House Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-08 - Referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections
Pending: House Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Community policing standards; creating the Oklahoma Community Policing Standards Task Force; effective date.
Title
Community policing standards; creating the Oklahoma Community Policing Standards Task Force; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-25 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS (Y: 2 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2021-02-08 | House | Withdrawn from Public Safety Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Nichols |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2414 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections