OK HB2396 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Approved by Governor 05/30/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Approved by Governor 05/30/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Criminal procedure; authorizing continuous protective orders upon specific findings by the court; effective date.
Title
Criminal procedure; authorizing continuous protective orders upon specific findings by the court; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-25 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - House - House: Conference Committee on Public Safety,: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - House - House: Conference Committee on Public Safety,: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | Approved by Governor 05/30/2012 | |
2012-05-25 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-25 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-05-25 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-05-25 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-25 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 41 Nays: 2 | |
2012-05-25 | coauthored by Johnson (Constance) | |
2012-05-25 | 2 CCR adopted | |
2012-05-25 | 2 CCR read | |
2012-05-25 | To Senate | |
2012-05-25 | Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 | |
2012-05-25 | 2 CCR adopted | |
2012-05-22 | 2 CCR submitted | |
2012-05-22 | Further conference granted, same conferees | |
2012-05-21 | CCR rejected, further conference requested, same conferees | |
2012-05-17 | CCR submitted | |
2012-05-08 | Conference granted, SCs named David, Sykes, Griffin, Brinkley, Burrage, Garrison | |
2012-05-03 | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety, Judiciary and Military Affairs | |
2012-04-30 | SA's received | |
2012-04-30 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-04-25 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-25 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-25 | Title restored | |
2012-04-25 | General Order, Amended | |
2012-04-09 | coauthored by Brecheen | |
2012-04-09 | Title stricken | |
2012-04-09 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-15 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2012-03-12 | First Reading | |
2012-03-12 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-08 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 4 | |
2012-03-08 | Amended | |
2012-03-08 | General Order | |
2012-02-14 | Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-14 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Rousselot | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 60 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 60 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 60 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |