OK HB2395 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2395
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Approved by Governor 04/16/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Approved by Governor 04/16/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Landlord and tenant; Oklahoma Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; modifying disposition of abandoned personal property; effective date.
Title
Landlord and tenant; Oklahoma Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; modifying disposition of abandoned personal property; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | House | Approved by Governor 04/16/2019 |
2019-04-11 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-11 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 8 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2019-03-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-04 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 98 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-04 | House | Amended |
2019-03-04 | House | Authored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-04 | House | General Order |
2019-02-20 | House | Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author) |
2019-02-20 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Kannady |
2019-02-20 | House | Remove Representative Kannady as principal House author and substitute with Representative Strom |
2019-02-20 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Kannady |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2395 (Carry Over) 2019-04-16 - Approved by Governor 04/16/2019