OK HB2391 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Approved by Governor 05/25/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Approved by Governor 05/25/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Corporation Commission; providing for apportionment to the Weigh Station Improvement Revolving Fund; effective date.
Title
Corporation Commission; providing for apportionment to the Weigh Station Improvement Revolving Fund; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-21 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 70 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - House - House: General Conference Committee: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 58 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 66 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Natural Resources &: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 70 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - House - House: General Conference Committee: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 58 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 66 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Natural Resources &: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | Approved by Governor 05/25/2012 | |
2012-05-22 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-22 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-05-22 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-05-21 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-21 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | |
2012-05-21 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2012-05-16 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2012-05-16 | To Senate | |
2012-05-16 | Measure passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 16 | |
2012-05-16 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2012-05-15 | Title restored | |
2012-05-15 | CCR submitted, GCCA | |
2012-05-03 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2012-04-26 | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA | |
2012-04-25 | SA's received | |
2012-04-25 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-04-24 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-24 | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-24 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-04-09 | coauthored by Stanislawski | |
2012-04-09 | Title stricken | |
2012-04-09 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-15 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2012-03-12 | First Reading | |
2012-03-12 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-08 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 66 Nays: 21; Ayes: 58 Nays: 26 | |
2012-03-08 | General Order | |
2012-02-29 | Authored by Senator Bingman (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-29 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Brumbaugh | |
2012-02-29 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Liebmann | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |