OK HB2390 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2390
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-17 - Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-17 - Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Grand River Dam Authority; powers and duties of the Board; funds; obligations and bonds; effective date; emergency.
Title
Grand River Dam Authority; powers and duties of the Board; funds; obligations and bonds; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-15 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 75 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 68 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 20 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 68 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 20 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2017-05-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-05-15 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-05-15 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-05-15 | House | Motion to reconsider tabled |
2017-05-15 | House | Emergency passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 18 |
2017-05-15 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Osborn (Leslie) |
2017-05-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 25 |
2017-05-15 | House | JCR adopted |
2017-05-15 | House | General Order |
2017-05-11 | House | Emergency added |
2017-05-11 | House | JCR; Do pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2017-04-24 | House | Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2017-04-20 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Fields |
2017-04-20 | House | Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author) |
2017-04-20 | House | Authored by Representative Osborn (Leslie), Wallace |
2017-04-20 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2390 (Carry Over) 2017-05-17 - Direct to Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
82 | 862 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 862 | 2 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 863 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 865 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 870 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |