OK HB2384 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public health and safety; relating to a drug prior authorization program approved by the Medicaid Drug Utilization Review Board; removing certain drug; effective date; emergency.
Title
Public health and safety; relating to a drug prior authorization program approved by the Medicaid Drug Utilization Review Board; removing certain drug; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Crain [R] | Rep. Doug Cox [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-11 - House - House: Public Health committee meeting: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | House | Approved by Governor 05/28/2014 |
2014-05-23 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-05-23 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-05-22 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | CCR adopted, GCCA |
2014-05-21 | Senate | CCR read, GCCA |
2014-05-21 | House | To Senate |
2014-05-21 | House | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0 |
2014-05-21 | House | CCR adopted |
2014-05-20 | House | Enacting clause restored |
2014-05-20 | House | Title restored |
2014-05-20 | House | CCR submitted |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Conference granted, GCCA |
2014-04-30 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Public Health |
2014-04-24 | House | SA's received |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 2 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Emergency added |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2014-03-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-17 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 58 Nays: 25 |
2014-03-13 | House | Title stricken |
2014-03-13 | House | Amended |
2014-03-13 | House | General Order |
2014-02-13 | House | Authored by Senator Crain (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-13 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Cox |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 1016 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 1016 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 5030 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |