OK HB2374 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 71-32)
Status: Passed on May 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Motor vehicles; providing certain exemption for vehicles towed by wrecker operators; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles; providing certain exemption for vehicles towed by wrecker operators; effective date.

Sponsors

Rep. Don Armes [R]Rep. Gary Banz [R]Rep. John Bennett [R]Rep. Lisa Billy [R]
Rep. Gus Blackwell [R]Rep. Mike Brown [D]Rep. David Brumbaugh [R]Rep. Ed Cannaday [D]
Rep. Dennis Casey [R]Rep. Mike Christian [R]Rep. Josh Cockroft [R]Rep. Donnie Condit [D]
Rep. Ann Coody [R]Rep. Marian Cooksey [R]Rep. Doug Cox [R]Rep. David Dank [R]
Rep. Lee Denney [R]Rep. David Derby [R]Rep. Dale DeWitt [R]Rep. Joe Dorman [D]
Rep. John Enns [R]Rep. Rusty Farley [R]Rep. George Faught [R]Rep. William Fourkiller [D]
Rep. Larry Glenn [D]Rep. Randon Grau [R]Rep. Elise Hall [R]Rep. Rebecca Hamilton [D]
Rep. Tommy Hardin [R]Rep. Jeffrey Hickman [R]Rep. Wes Hilliard [D]Rep. Corey Holland [R]
Rep. Chuck Hoskin [D]Rep. Scott Inman [D]Rep. Michael Jackson [R]Sen. Rob Johnson [R]
Rep. Fred Jordan [R]Rep. Charles Joyner [R]Rep. Sally Kern [R]Rep. Charles Key [R]
Rep. Dan Kirby [R]Rep. Steve Kouplen [D]Rep. Guy Liebmann [R]Rep. James Lockhart [D]
Rep. Scott Martin [R]Rep. Steve Martin [R]Sen. Al McAffrey [D]Rep. Mark McCullough [R]
Rep. Curtis McDaniel [D]Rep. Jeannie McDaniel [D]Rep. Randy McDaniel [R]Rep. Skye McNiel [R]
Rep. Jerry McPeak [D]Rep. Lewis Moore [R]Rep. Danny Morgan [D]Rep. Richard Morrissette [D]
Rep. Glen Mulready [R]Rep. Jason Murphey [R]Rep. Jason Nelson [R]Rep. Tom Newell [R]
Rep. Jadine Nollan [R]Rep. Charles Ortega [R]Rep. Leslie Osborn [R]Rep. Pat Ownbey [R]
Rep. Ron Peters [R]Rep. Pam Peterson [R]Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D]Rep. Eric Proctor [D]
Rep. Raymond Pruett [D]Sen. Marty Quinn [R]Rep. Brian Renegar [D]Rep. Mike Reynolds [R]
Rep. Phil Richardson [R]Rep. Mike Ritze [R]Rep. Paul Roan [D]Rep. Dustin Roberts [R]
Rep. Sean Roberts [R]Rep. Wade Rousselot [D]Rep. Todd Russ [R]Rep. Mike Sanders [R]
Rep. Michael Schwartz [R]Rep. Seneca Scott [D]Rep. Earl Sears [R]Rep. Tahrohon Shannon [R]
Rep. Mike Shelton [D]Rep. Ben Sherrer [D]Rep. Jerry Shoemake [D]Sen. Ralph Shortey [R]
Sen. Jabar Shumate [D]Rep. Kris Steele [R]Rep. Aaron Stiles [R]Sen. Anthony Sykes [R]
Rep. Randy Terrill [R]Rep. Todd Thomsen [R]Rep. Sue Tibbs [R]Rep. John Trebilcock [R]
Rep. Steve Vaughan [R]Rep. Emily Virgin [D]Rep. Purcy Walker [D]Rep. Weldon Watson [R]
Rep. Paul Wesselhoft [R]Rep. Cory Williams [D]Rep. Harold Wright [R]

Roll Calls

2012-05-02 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-08 Approved by Governor 05/08/2012
2012-05-03 Sent to Governor
2012-05-03 Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
2012-05-03 Enrolled, signed, to Senate
2012-05-02 Referred for enrollment
2012-05-02 Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
2012-05-02 Coauthored by all other Representatives
2012-05-02 SA's read, adopted
2012-04-30 SA's received
2012-04-30 Engrossed to House
2012-04-25 Referred for engrossment
2012-04-25 Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
2012-04-25 coauthored by Shortey
2012-04-25 General Order, Considered
2012-04-03 Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed
2012-03-08 Second Reading referred to Public Safety
2012-03-01 First Reading
2012-03-01 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2012-02-29 Referred for engrossment
2012-02-29 Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0
2012-02-29 Coauthored by Representative(s) Roan
2012-02-29 General Order
2012-02-22 Authored by Senator Sykes (principal Senate author)
2012-02-22 CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee
2012-02-07 Second Reading referred to Public Safety
2012-02-06 Authored by Representative Tibbs
2012-02-06 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
474105New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback