OK HB2373 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]

Summary

Counties and county officers; authorizing county commissioners to execute deeds for certain property; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Counties and county officers; authorizing county commissioners to execute deeds for certain property; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-25 Died in conference
2012-05-07 Conference granted, SCs named Ballenger, Aldridge, Ivester, Crain, Coates, Barrington
2012-05-02 SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on General Government and Transportation
2012-04-24 SA's received
2012-04-24 Engrossed to House
2012-04-23 Referred for engrossment
2012-04-23 Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
2012-04-23 Title stricken
2012-04-23 General Order, Amended
2012-03-28 Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
2012-03-15 Second Reading referred to General Government
2012-03-08 First Reading
2012-03-08 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2012-03-07 Referred for engrossment
2012-03-07 Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0
2012-03-07 Coauthored by Representative(s) Condit
2012-03-07 General Order
2012-02-16 Authored by Senator Ballenger (principal Senate author)
2012-02-16 CR; Do Pass General Government Committee
2012-02-07 Second Reading referred to General Government
2012-02-06 Authored by Representative Sanders
2012-02-06 First Reading

Subjects


Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback