OK HB2367 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by Governor 05/22/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by Governor 05/22/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Motor vehicles; authorizing waiver of written and driving examination for motorcycle endorsements and driver licenses under certain circumstances; effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; authorizing waiver of written and driving examination for motorcycle endorsements and driver licenses under certain circumstances; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Lisa Billy [R] | Rep. Lee Denney [R] | Rep. Chuck Hoskin [D] | Rep. Mike Reynolds [R] |
Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] | Sen. Ralph Shortey [R] | Sen. Anthony Sykes [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 34 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - House - House: Conference Committee on Public Safety,: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 76 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - House - House: Conference Committee on Public Safety,: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 76 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by Governor 05/22/2012 | |
2012-05-18 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-18 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-05-18 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-05-17 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-17 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 34 Nays: 9 | |
2012-05-17 | CCR adopted | |
2012-05-16 | CCR read | |
2012-05-16 | To Senate | |
2012-05-16 | Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 0 | |
2012-05-16 | CCR adopted | |
2012-05-14 | CCR submitted | |
2012-05-03 | Conference granted, SCs named Sykes, Barrington, Mazzei, David, Burrage, Ivester | |
2012-05-02 | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety, Judiciary and Military Affairs | |
2012-04-30 | SA's received | |
2012-04-30 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-04-25 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-25 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-25 | General Order, Amended | |
2012-04-03 | coauthored by Shortey | |
2012-04-03 | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2012-02-28 | First Reading | |
2012-02-28 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-02-27 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-02-27 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 | |
2012-02-27 | Amended | |
2012-02-27 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Denney | |
2012-02-27 | Considered | |
2012-02-27 | Laid over | |
2012-02-27 | House Rule suspended | |
2012-02-27 | Authored by Senator Sykes (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-27 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer, Reynolds | |
2012-02-27 | General Order | |
2012-02-15 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hoskin | |
2012-02-15 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Billy | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | 6 | 101 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 6 | 105 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 6 | 110 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 6 | 122 | New Code | See Bill Text |