OK HB2365 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Environment and natural resources; modifying exception to the regulation of certain radiation sources; effective date.
Title
Environment and natural resources; modifying exception to the regulation of certain radiation sources; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: Agriculture, Wildlife & Environment Committee: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: Agriculture, Wildlife & Environment Committee: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-23 | Approved by Governor 04/23/2012 | |
2012-04-17 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-04-17 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-17 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-16 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-04-16 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-16 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-16 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-03-29 | coauthored by Crain | |
2012-03-29 | Remove as author Senator Crain; authored by Senator Simpson | |
2012-03-29 | Reported Do Pass Energy committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Energy | |
2012-02-14 | First Reading | |
2012-02-14 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-02-13 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-02-13 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 | |
2012-02-13 | General Order | |
2012-02-08 | Authored by Senator Crain (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-08 | CR; Do Pass Agriculture, Wildlife and Environment Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture, Wildlife and Environment | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Billy | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
27A | 1 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27A | 2 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |