OK HB2364 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Crimes and punishments; modifying list of statutory references; effective date

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes and punishments; modifying list of statutory references; effective date

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-09 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16HouseApproved by Governor 05/16/2019
2019-05-13HouseSent to Governor
2019-05-13SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2019-05-13HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2019-05-09HouseReferred for enrollment
2019-05-09HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
2019-05-09HouseSA's read, adopted
2019-04-24HouseSA's received
2019-04-24SenateEngrossed to House
2019-04-23SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-04-23SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
2019-04-23SenateEnacting clause restored
2019-04-23SenateTitle restored
2019-04-23SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2019-04-09SenateEnacting clause stricken
2019-04-09SenateReported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2019-03-13SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-13HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-12HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-12HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0
2019-03-12HouseTitle stricken
2019-03-12HouseAmended
2019-03-12HouseAuthored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author)
2019-03-12HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-13HouseCR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Kannady
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2364&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/hB/HB2364%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/HB2364%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/hB/HB2364%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/HB2364%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB2364%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/hB/HB2364%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2364_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB2364_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback