OK HB2359 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2359
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-04 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-04 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Coin-operated devices; increasing amount of annual fee for certain types of devices; effective date; emergency.
Title
Coin-operated devices; increasing amount of annual fee for certain types of devices; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 20 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-04-27 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | Motion expired |
2017-05-02 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Wallace |
2017-05-02 | House | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 20 Nays: 76 |
2017-05-02 | House | JCR adopted |
2017-05-02 | House | General Order |
2017-04-27 | House | Emergency added |
2017-04-27 | House | JCR; Do pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2017-04-24 | House | Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2017-04-20 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Fields |
2017-04-20 | House | Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author) |
2017-04-20 | House | Authored by Representative Osborn (Leslie), Wallace |
2017-04-20 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2359 (Carry Over) 2017-05-04 - Motion expired