OK HB2358 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Public safety; driver licenses; allowing appropriate agencies to receive photographs through certain electronic systems; effective dates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public safety; driver licenses; allowing appropriate agencies to receive photographs through certain electronic systems; effective dates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2019-03-18SenateCoauthored by Representative Ford
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-18HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-14HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-14HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 1
2019-03-14HouseTitle stricken
2019-03-14HouseAmended
2019-03-14HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-21HouseAuthored by Senator Pemberton (principal Senate author)
2019-02-21HouseCR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Meredith
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback