OK HB2353 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-16 - Approved by Governor 04/13/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-16 - Approved by Governor 04/13/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Agriculture; Oklahoma Swine Feeding Operations Act; modifying frequency of educational training requirements; effective date.
Title
Agriculture; Oklahoma Swine Feeding Operations Act; modifying frequency of educational training requirements; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: Agriculture, Wildlife & Environment Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: Agriculture, Wildlife & Environment Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-16 | Approved by Governor 04/13/2012 | |
2012-04-09 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-04-09 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-05 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-04 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-04-04 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-04 | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-04 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-03-29 | coauthored by Pittman | |
2012-03-29 | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development | |
2012-02-14 | First Reading | |
2012-02-14 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-02-13 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-02-13 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 | |
2012-02-13 | General Order | |
2012-02-08 | Authored by Senator Justice (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-08 | CR; Do Pass Agriculture, Wildlife and Environment Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture, Wildlife and Environment | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Kouplen | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |