OK HB2352 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Approved by Governor 04/20/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Approved by Governor 04/20/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Securities; modifying notice filing procedure to comply with federal law; adding notice filing; effective date.
Title
Securities; modifying notice filing procedure to comply with federal law; adding notice filing; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House: Banking and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House: Banking and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | House | Approved by Governor 04/20/2016 |
2016-04-14 | House | Sent to Governor |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2016-04-14 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2016-04-13 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Title restored |
2016-04-13 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Senate Rule suspended |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2016-03-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-03-03 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-03-02 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-02 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 |
2016-03-02 | House | Authored by Senator Mazzei (principal Senate author) |
2016-03-02 | House | General Order |
2016-02-16 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Banking and Financial Services Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Banking and Financial Services |
2016-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Russ |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
71 | 1 | 302 | New Code | See Bill Text |
71 | 1 | 401 | New Code | See Bill Text |
71 | 2 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |